+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Mar 5) Ch 16.
- Passed Senate (34-5).
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
- Referred to Senate Education.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (63-0).
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Education.
- Referred to House Education and House Appropriations & Finance.
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2014: Final Senate Vote
February 18, 2014: Final House Vote
February 17, 2014: HAFC Committee Report
February 14, 2014: HEC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor