+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Judiciary.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (66-0).
- Floor amendment adopted.
On March 8, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and House Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2015: Final House Vote
March 9, 2015: HJC Committee Report
February 16, 2015: HRPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor