+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/15/2020Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/28/2020Not Printed
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/30/2020Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/30/2020Printed
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/30/2020Referred to: HCPAC/HJC/HAFC
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 02/05/2020HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/11/2020HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/11/2020Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/14/2020House of Representatives Floor Amendment
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/14/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:1