+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/16/2020Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/28/2020Not Printed
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/30/2020Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/30/2020Printed
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/30/2020Referred to: HJC
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/13/2020HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/15/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:47 N:17
+ − Vote
February 15, 2020: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor