+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Apr 7) Ch 64.
- Passed Senate (38-0).
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Conservation.
- Referred to Senate Conservation and Senate Corporations & Transportation.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (55-0).
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy, Environment & Natural Resources.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment & Natural Resources and House Regulatory & Public Affairs.
+ − Votes (6)
March 18, 2015: Final Senate Vote
March 17, 2015: SCORC Committee Report
March 13, 2015: SCONC Committee Report
February 20, 2015: Final House Vote
February 17, 2015: HRPAC Committee Report
February 9, 2015: HEENC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor