+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 17Calendar Day: 02/10/2018Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC
On December 15, 2017 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/09/2018Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:5
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/08/2018HLELC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/07/2018HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2018Referred to: HHHC/HLELC
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2018HCal: Bill falls within the purview of a 30 day session and ordered printed
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2018Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/16/2018Not Printed
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF
+ − Vote
February 9, 2018: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor