+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:30 N:9
- House has concurred with Senate Amendments
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 68 - Mar. 30
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HCEDC
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2023: Final Senate Vote
February 27, 2023: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor