+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed.
- Passed Senate (33-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Judiciary.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House (51-10).
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs.
- Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and House Judiciary.
+ − Votes (6)
March 20, 2015: Final Senate Vote
March 19, 2015: SJC Committee Report
March 16, 2015: SPAC Committee Report
March 7, 2015: Final House Vote
March 3, 2015: HJC Committee Report
February 18, 2015: HGEIC Committee Report
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor