+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
On March 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
- House of Representatives Floor Amendment
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC