+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (61-0).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Business & Industry.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Business & Industry.
- Printed.
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules & Order of Business.
- Not printed.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pre-filed in House.
+ − Votes (3)
February 19, 2014: Final House Vote
February 19, 2014: HBIC Committee Report
February 17, 2014: HCPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor