+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/16/2020Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/15/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/14/2020HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 02/03/2020HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2020Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HTRC
+ − Vote
February 15, 2020: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor