+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 11 - Feb. 4
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 01/31/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 01/30/2019SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/24/2019Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/23/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:69 N:0
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/22/2019HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/17/2019Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2019: Final Senate Vote
January 23, 2019: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor