+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 8 - Feb.26
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/19/2020House has concurred with Senate Amendments
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/17/2020Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/15/2020SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 10Calendar Day: 02/13/2020Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/12/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/08/2020HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 02/03/2020HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2020Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HAFC
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2020: Final Senate Vote
February 12, 2020: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor