+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 57 - Mar. 2
- Legislative Day: 20Calendar Day: 02/15/2018Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:3
- Legislative Day: 19Calendar Day: 02/14/2018Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 19Calendar Day: 02/14/2018Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/13/2018Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/13/2018HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/08/2018HBIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/05/2018Referred to: HBIC/HTRC
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/05/2018HCal: Bill falls within the purview of a 30 day session and ordered printed
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/05/2018Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/25/2018Not Printed