+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC
On March 6, 2021 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:1
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC
+ − Vote
March 6, 2021: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor