+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action action postponed indefinitely.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (56-4).
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Judiciary.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor & Human Resources.
- Referred to House Labor & Human Resources and House Appropriations & Finance.
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2014: SPAC Committee Report
February 10, 2014: Final House Vote
February 5, 2014: HLC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor