+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (54-6).
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
- Referred to House Taxation & Revenue.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs Committee and House Taxation & Revenue.
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 2014: Final House Vote
February 15, 2014: HTRC Committee Report
February 10, 2014: HHGIC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor