+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 137 - Apr. 9
- House has concurred with Senate Amendments
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed in the Senate - Y:29 N:13
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:10
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2021: Final Senate Vote
February 24, 2021: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor