+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 67 - Mar. 6
- Legislative Day: 18Calendar Day: 02/20/2020Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
- Legislative Day: 16Calendar Day: 02/19/2020SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/15/2020Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/15/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:1
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/14/2020HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 02/03/2020HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2020Referred to: HJC/HAFC
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2020Printed
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/24/2020Not Printed
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF