+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Legislative Day: 23Calendar Day: 03/14/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:2
- Legislative Day: 20Calendar Day: 03/08/2019SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 19Calendar Day: 03/05/2019SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 13Calendar Day: 02/21/2019Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC
On January 2, 2019 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/20/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:39 N:21
- Legislative Day: 8Calendar Day: 02/20/2019House of Representatives Floor Amendment
- Legislative Day: 6Calendar Day: 02/13/2019Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/05/2019HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/17/2019Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HAFC
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF