+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Judiciary.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (65-0).
- Floor amendment adopted.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs.
- Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs and House Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2013: Final House Vote
February 19, 2013: HJC Committee Report
February 1, 2013: HCPAC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor