+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 210 - Apr. 3
- Legislative Day: 22Calendar Day: 03/12/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0
- Legislative Day: 22Calendar Day: 03/12/2019SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 21Calendar Day: 03/09/2019SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/11/2019Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/08/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:0
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 02/04/2019HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 01/30/2019HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/17/2019Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HTRC
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2019: Final Senate Vote
February 8, 2019: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor