+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed (Mar 21) Ch 26.
- Passed Senate (39-0).
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (49-0).
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules.
- Referred to Senate Rules and Senate Judiciary.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Voters & Elections.
- Referred to House Voters & Elections and House Judiciary.
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2013: Final Senate Vote
March 12, 2013: SJC Committee Report
February 14, 2013: Final House Vote
February 12, 2013: HJC Committee Report
January 31, 2013: HVEC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor