+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (36-24).
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
- Referred to House Taxation & Revenue.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation & Public Works.
- Referred to House Transportation & Public Works and House Taxation & Revenue.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-filed in House.
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 2014: Final House Vote
February 15, 2014: HTRC Committee Report
February 11, 2014: HTPWC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor