+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed BY GOV (Mar 5) Ch 14.
- Passed Senate (40-1).
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (66-0).
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted and then.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Printed.
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules & Order of Business.
- Not printed.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-filed in House.
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2014: Final Senate Vote
February 18, 2014: SJC Committee Report
February 15, 2014: Final House Vote
February 15, 2014: HJC Committee Report
February 10, 2014: HHGIC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor