+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Do pass; committee report adopted action postponed indefinitely.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Do pass as amended; committee report adopted.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Public Affairs and Senate Judiciary.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (67-0).
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2013: SJC Committee Report
March 9, 2013: SPAC Committee Report
January 28, 2013: Final House Vote
January 24, 2013: HJC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor