+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/07/2020Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC
- Legislative Day: 9Calendar Day: 02/11/2020SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/17/2020SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 16Calendar Day: 02/18/2020Passed in the Senate - Y:26 N:16
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 61 - Mar. 6
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/23/2020Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HJC
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/30/2020HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 02/04/2020HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/06/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0