+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action Postponed Indefinitely
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to: HAFC
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HGEIC
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar, ordered printed and referred to
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Not Printed
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF
+ − Vote
February 11, 2016: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor