+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed Ch192.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-0).
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance.
- Do pass; committee report adopted.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary and Senate Finance.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House (61-0).
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations & Finance.
- Committee substitute and then do pass; committee report adopted.
- Do not pass; committee report adopted.
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary.
- Referred to House Judiciary and House Appropriations & Finance.
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2013: Final Senate Vote
March 12, 2013: SJC Committee Report
February 20, 2013: Final House Vote
February 14, 2013: HJC Committee Report
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor