+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Legislative Day: 7Calendar Day: 02/07/2020Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/14/2020SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 12Calendar Day: 02/15/2020SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 16Calendar Day: 02/19/2020Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 27 - Mar. 4
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/22/2020Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HSEIC
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/28/2020HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 4Calendar Day: 02/04/2020HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 5Calendar Day: 02/06/2020Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2020: Final Senate Vote
February 6, 2020: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor