+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
- Signed by Governor - Chapter 1 - Jan. 25
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/23/2019House has concurred with Senate Amendments
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/23/2019Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/22/2019Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC
- Legislative Day: 3Calendar Day: 01/22/2019SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/16/2019Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Legislative Day: 2Calendar Day: 01/16/2019Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/16/2019HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
- Legislative Day: 1Calendar Day: 01/15/2019Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2019: Final Senate Vote
January 16, 2019: Final House Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor