+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2018, JR-10.
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
- Substituted for AJR129
On September 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- 2nd Reading in the Assembly By order of The Speaker
On July 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
On July 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (33-0)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (4)
September 27, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 27, 2018: SUB FOR AJR129
- Present/NV: 80
July 26, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
May 31, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor