+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Filed with Secretary of State
- Resolution Passed Assembly (77-0-0)
- Substituted for ACR92
On June 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 18, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
June 18, 2020: SUB FOR ACR92
- Present/NV: 80
June 15, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
March 5, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor