+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (27-12)
On June 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Public Hearing Held SEN
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 29, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2015: r/Sca
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor