+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
On July 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (28-3)
On July 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Public Hearing Held SBA
On June 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
On June 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
+ − Vote
July 26, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 9