+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (32-0) (Bucco)
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 9, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
June 3, 2021: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
June 3, 2021: AMEND
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
December 7, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8