+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.66.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-3)
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (65-7-0)
- Substituted for A631 (1R)
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On March 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (32-2)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
+ − Votes (5)
June 29, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 8
June 29, 2020: SUB FOR A631
- Present/NV: 80
June 29, 2020: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
June 26, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
March 19, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor