+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-21-0)
- Substituted for A3093
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (23-11)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
+ − Votes (5)
March 14, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 6
March 14, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR A3093
- Present/NV: 80
March 3, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 11, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
February 4, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1