+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
January 28, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor