+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.119.
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0)
- Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0)
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
- Substituted for A5064
On January 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On November 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (8)
June 21, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 40
June 21, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
June 3, 2021: ADOPT GR
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
March 25, 2021: SUB FOR A5064
- Present/NV: 79
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
January 25, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor