+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.102.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-1-0)
- Substituted for A3141 (1R)
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (33-0)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
+ − Votes (6)
March 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2019: SUB FOR A3141 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
March 18, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
February 7, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
December 6, 2018: r/Sca
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor