+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted by A2297
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
+ − Vote
June 1, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3