+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On December 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
- Substituted for A1527 (1R)
On November 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On November 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
- Emergency Resolution (38-0) (Beach)
- Senate Amendment (37-0) (Beach)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (9)
December 2, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
December 2, 2021: SUB FOR A1527
- Present/NV: 80
November 15, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
November 15, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 6
June 30, 2021: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
June 30, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 30, 2021: AMEND
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 30, 2021: EMERGENCY
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor