+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2013, c.14.
On December 17, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (47-30-0)
- Substituted for A1084 (1R)
On December 13, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On September 24, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
On August 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (33-0)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
+ − Votes (6)
December 17, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 3
December 17, 2012: SUBSTITUTE FOR A1084 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
December 11, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
August 20, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
March 8, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2012: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor