+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (5)
On December 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (22-15)
On July 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
+ − Votes (3)
December 10, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 16, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
July 21, 2014: r/Sca
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor