+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.297.
On December 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
- Substituted for A2536 (1R)
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On October 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (37-0) (Oroho)
On September 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (7)
December 16, 2019: SUB FOR A2536
- Present/NV: 80
December 16, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
June 6, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
December 17, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
October 29, 2018: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
October 29, 2018: AMEND
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
September 24, 2018: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor