+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.98.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-1)
- Substituted for A4060
On January 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to enact
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-0)
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to enact
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2019: SUB FOR A4060
- Present/NV: 80
January 28, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
June 25, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 4, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13