+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.120.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-5)
- Substituted for A3648 (ACS)
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (32-1)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
+ − Votes (4)
March 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 4
March 25, 2019: SUB FOR A3648 Acs
- Present/NV: 80
March 14, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
March 7, 2019: r/SCS
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor