+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)
- Substituted for A2352 (1R)
On December 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
+ − Votes (6)
January 8, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
January 8, 2018: SUBSTITUTE FOR A2352 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
December 18, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
June 26, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
June 1, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
February 6, 2017: r/Sca
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor