+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)
- Substituted for A6000
On December 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (34-0)
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
December 20, 2021: SUB FOR A6000
- Present/NV: 80
December 9, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
December 2, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
November 8, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor